EP0847185 - Light beam scanning device and control method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.2006 [2006/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/08] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | ||
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takada, Norihisa Fuji Photo Film Co.Ltd. 798 Miyanodai,Kaisei-Machi Ashigarakami-gun, Kanagawa / JP | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Winzererstrasse 106 80797 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121347.5 | 04.12.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | JP19960340371 | 06.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34037196 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0847185 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0847185 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847185 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/047 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
H04N1/1916 (EP,US);
H04N1/047 (EP,US);
H04N1/1917 (EP,US);
H04N1/1135 (EP,US);
H04N1/1911 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02425 (EP,US);
H04N2201/0471 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04729 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04731 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04732 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04734 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04744 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04746 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04781 (EP,US);
H04N2201/04789 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/30] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Lichtstrahlabtastgerät und Steuerverfahren dafür | [1998/24] | English: | Light beam scanning device and control method therefor | [1998/24] | French: | Dispositif de balayage d'un faiseau lumineux et procédé de commande pour cela | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 07.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US4310757 (CHECK JR FRANK T, et al) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 47 - column 2, line 18 * [A] 5; | [YA]US4864326 (KAWAMURA NAOTO [JP], et al) [Y] 1,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 13 * [A] 5; | [A]US4279472 (STREET GRAHAM S B) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 11 - line 60 * * column 5, line 67 - column 7, line 21 *; | [A]US5386221 (ALLEN PAUL C [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract *; | [A]US4600837 (DISTEFANO THOMAS H [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |