EP0922550 - Apparatus for spraying wetted building materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2000 [2000/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROMBOLD & GFRÖHRER GmbH & CO. KG Rittweg 1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [1999/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rombold, Albrecht Rittweg 1 71254 Ditzingen / DE | [1999/24] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Gerokstrasse 6 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121357.4 | 04.12.1997 | [1999/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0922550 | Date: | 16.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B28C5/00 | [1999/24] | CPC: |
B28C5/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2000/08] |
Former [1999/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Spritzen von befeuchteten Trockenbaustoffen | [1999/24] | English: | Apparatus for spraying wetted building materials | [1999/24] | French: | Dispositif de projection de matériaux de construction humidifiés | [1999/24] | Examination procedure | 19.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/44] | 23.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 01.02.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 01.02.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 01.02.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0509966 (VISINI GIANPIERO & C S N C B V ;G M S N C DEI F LLI VISINI GIA (IT) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 1, line 44 *; | [Y]US3788353 (BREUNSBACH M) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * abstract * * column 1, line 8 - column 2, line 4 *; | [Y]US3743187 (BREUNSBACH M) [Y] 1,2,4-10 * abstract *; | [Y]DE3408007 (MUELLER WILHELM MASCHF) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * |