EP0849268 - Polycyclic iminooxadiazindiones from (cyclo)aliphatic 1,4-diisocyanates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Frank, Dr. Walter-Flex-Strasse 32 51373 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
Mager, Dieter Elisabeth von Thadden-Strasse 31 51377 Leverkusen / DE | 03 /
Pedain, Josef, Dr. Haferkamp 6 51061 Köln / DE | [1998/26] | Application number, filing date | 97121543.9 | 08.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | DE1996153583 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19653583 | [1998/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849268 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849268 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07D498/04, C08G18/79, // (C07D498/04, 273:00, 243:00) | [1998/26] | CPC: |
C07D498/04 (EP,US);
C08G18/79 (EP,US);
C08G2101/00 (EP,US);
C08G2150/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polycyclische Iminooxadiazindione aus (cyclo)aliphatischen 1,4-Diisocyanaten | [1998/26] | English: | Polycyclic iminooxadiazindiones from (cyclo)aliphatic 1,4-diisocyanates | [1998/26] | French: | Iminooxadiazindiones polycycliques à partir de 1,4-diisocyanates (cyclo)aliphatiques | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 14.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3739549 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]); | [AD]DE3902078 (BAYER AG [DE]) [AD] 1 * Seite 2, Formel (III); Seite 6, Beispiele 6-9 *; | [AD]EP0571038 (DSM NV [NL]) [AD] 6 * examples I-III *; | [ADP]DE19532060 (BAYER AG [DE]) [ADP] 1,7-9 * claim - *; | [ADP]DE19611849 (BAYER AG [DE]) [ADP] 1 * Seite 3, Formel B *; | [A] - B. AKTERIES ET AL., CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1986), vol. 119, pages 1133 - 43, XP002059955 [A] 1 * Seite 1135, Verbindungen 6a-e; Seite 1139, Zeilen 9-36 * | [AD] - K. H. SLOTTA ET AL., BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1927), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 295 - 301, XP002059956 [AD] 1 * Seite 296, Verbindung II. * | [AD] - K. H. SLOTTA ET AL., BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN CHEMISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1927), vol. 60, no. 4, pages 1011 - 1020, XP002059957 [AD] 1 * Seite 1011, Verbindung I. * | [AD] - A. ETIENNE ET AL., COMPT. REND. ACAD. SC. PARIS, (1973), vol. C 277, pages 795 - 8, XP002034781 [AD] 1 * Seite 796, Verbindung 2 * | [AD] - E. SCHAUMANN ET AL., CHEMISCHE BERICHTE, (1987), vol. 120, pages 339 - 44, XP002059958 [AD] 1 * Seite 340, linke Spalte, Verbindung 9 * |