EP0849865 - Manufacturing method of a permanent magnets commutator motor with a lower pole number and high resolution rotation sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.07.2002 [2002/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bellmann, Jürgen An den Mühltannen 39 97080 Würzburg / DE | 02 /
Hartel, Gerd, Dipl.-Ing. Friedenstrasse 66 97276 Margetshöchheim / DE | 03 /
König, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Jägerstrasse 14a 97082 Würzburg / DE | [1998/26] | Application number, filing date | 97121588.4 | 08.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | DE1996153208 | 19.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19653208 | [1998/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849865 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849865 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/03, H02K15/02 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
H02K15/00 (EP);
H02K15/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines permanenterregten niederpoligen Kommutatormotors mit einem hochpoligen Drehimpuls-Geber | [1998/26] | English: | Manufacturing method of a permanent magnets commutator motor with a lower pole number and high resolution rotation sensor | [1998/26] | French: | Méthode de fabrication d'un moteur à commutateur à aimants permanents avec un faible nombre de poles et un capteur de rotation à haute résolution | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 25.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH05244754 ; | [DA]DE4005337 (MITSUBA ELECTRIC MFG CO [JP]) [DA] 1 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940106), vol. 018, no. 003, Database accession no. (E - 1485), & JP05244754 A 19930921 (MITSUBA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | US4049984 | EP0547935 |