EP0847838 - Product scanner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gerhard Schubert GmbH Hofäckerstrasse 7 D-74564 Crailsheim / DE | [1998/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schubert, Ralf Adelheitsruh 14 74564 Crailsheim / DE | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/25] | Alber, Norbert, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121601.5 | 08.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | DE1996151717 | 12.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19651717 | [1998/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0847838 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0847838 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
B25J9/1697 (EP,US);
G01B11/04 (EP,US);
B65B5/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/13] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Produktscanner | [1998/25] | English: | Product scanner | [1998/25] | French: | Scanner de produit | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 02.07.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/04] | 12.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2001 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0663271 (ETHICON INC [US]) [Y] 1,4-12,15 * column 4, line 28 - column 10, line 5 * * column 13, line 42 - column 15, line 34 * * figures 1-3B * [A] 2,3,13,14,16,17; | [YA]US5243402 (WEBER KLAUS [DE], et al) [Y] 1,4-12,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * column 5, line 10 - column 6, line 37 * [A] 2,3,13,14,16,17; | [A]WO8803080 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP [US]) [A] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]GB2282444 (CIRCUIT FOIL SA [LU]) [A] 1,8 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 11 *; | [A]US4876728 (ROTH SCOTT D [US]) [A] 1,13 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * column 5, line 3 - column 6, line 11 *; | [A]US5579444 (DALZIEL MARIE R [GB], et al) [A] 1,14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * claims 1,3-6,10,11 *; | [A]JPH08261830 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 1997, no. 02, & JP08261830 A 19961011 (NISSHO CORP) [A] 1,13,15-17 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0749902 |