EP0847153 - Method and apparatus for measuring waveform quality of CDMA signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANTEST CORPORATION 32-1, Asahicho 1-chome Nerima-ku Tokyo 179 / JP | [2006/34] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states Advantest Corporation 32-1, Asahicho 1-chome Nerima-ku, Tokyo 179 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakada, Juichi 602-1, Niibori Kumagaya-shi, Saitama 360 / JP | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Hoffmann, Eckart, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121669.2 | 09.12.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | JP19960328402 | 09.12.1996 Original published format: JP 32840296 | [1998/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0847153 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0847153 | Date: | 21.07.1999 | [1999/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847153 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04B17/00, H04B1/707 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B17/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/13] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Messen der Wellenformqualität von CDMA-Signalen | [1998/24] | English: | Method and apparatus for measuring waveform quality of CDMA signal | [1998/24] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour mesurer la qualité de la forme d'onde de signaux AMRC | [2006/17] |
Former [1998/24] | Procédé et appareil pour mésurer la qualité de forme d'onde signaux AMDC | Examination procedure | 09.12.1997 | Examination requested [1998/24] | 05.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 23.08.2006 | GB | 09.12.2006 | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/23] | GB | 09.12.2006 | |
FR | 11.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | GB | 09.12.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - BIRGENHEIER R A, "OVERVIEW OF CODE-DOMAIN POWER, TIMING, AND PHASE MEASUREMENTS", HEWLETT-PACKARD JOURNAL, (19960201), vol. 47, no. 1, pages 73 - 93, XP000559992 [AD] 1,4 * page 79, column R, line 14 - page 85, column L, line 42; figure 12 * |