EP0848038 - Resin composition, conductive roller prepared by molding the composition and electronic photographic cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.05.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakogawa, Kouichi, Tsukuba Research Center Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-03 / JP | 02 /
Nishikawa, Manabu, Tsukuba Research Center Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-03 / JP | 03 /
Isaka, Tsutomu, Tsukuba Research Center Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-03 / JP | 04 /
Komatsuzaki, Koukichi, Tsukuba Research Center Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 8-3-1, Chuo Ami-machi, Inashiki-gun, Ibaraki 300-03 / JP | 05 /
Takahashi, Hideki, Yokkaichi Research Center Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation, 1, Toho-cho Yokkaichi, Mie 510 / JP | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121783.1 | 10.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | JP19960333454 | 13.12.1996 Original published format: JP 33345496 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848038 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/16, C08L53/02, C08K3/04, C08K3/08, G03G15/02, // (C08L23/16, 23:08),(C08L23/16, 33:06),(C08L53/02, 23:08),(C08L53/02, 33:06) | [1998/25] | CPC: |
G03G15/0233 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08L53/02 (EP,US);
C08L23/04 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K3/04, C08L23/16 (EP,US);
C08L23/16, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L53/02, C08L2666/04 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung, durch Giessen daraus hergestellte leitfähige Rolle und elektronische, photographische Kassette | [1998/25] | English: | Resin composition, conductive roller prepared by molding the composition and electronic photographic cartridge | [1998/25] | French: | Composition de résine, rouleau conducteur préparé par moulage de la même et cartouche photographique électronique | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 31.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/25] | 17.01.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH05147763 ; | [PX]JPH0971699 ; | JPS62285925 [ ] (NOK CORP); | [X]EP0574169 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,18,19 * example -; claim - *; | JPH07102131 [ ] (NISHIKAWA RUBBER CO LTD); | JPH05279521 [ ] (NIPPON OILS & FATS CO., LTD.) | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 93, no. 28, Database accession no. 93-224045, XP002060244 & JPH05147763 A 19930615 (ARAI SEISAKUSHO KK) [X] 1,2,5,18,19 * abstract * | [PX] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 97, no. 46, Database accession no. 97-492900, XP002060245 & JPH0971699 A 19970318 (NISHIKAWA GOMU KOGYO KK) [PX] 1,2,5,18,19 * abstract * | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19880516), vol. 108, no. 20, Database accession no. 169013, XP002060241 [X] 1-3,5-9,11-16,18 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19950724), vol. 123, no. 4, Database accession no. 35101, XP002060242 [A] 1-17 * abstract * | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940418), vol. 120, no. 16, Database accession no. 193855, XP002060243 [A] 1-18 * abstract * |