EP0850900 - Zirconia based article, its use as wear resistant part of a wristwatch and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.10.2002 [2002/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 2501 Biel / CH | [1998/49] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states SMH Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 CH-2501 Biel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magnin, Pierre Chemin de Faulieu 17 1053-Cugy / CH | 02 /
Michel, Béatrice Pré-de-Riaux 1588 Montet sur Cudrefin / CH | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Ravenel, Thierry Gérard Louis, et al I C B, Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA, 7, rue des Sors 2074 Marin / CH | Application number, filing date | 97121854.0 | 11.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | EP19960120856 | 23.12.1996 Original published format: EP 96120856 | [1998/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850900 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850900 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | FR | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/87, C04B35/486, G04B37/22 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP);
C04B35/486 (EP);
C04B41/5057 (EP);
C04B41/87 (EP);
G04B37/223 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/48 (EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/486 (EP);
C04B41/5057, C04B41/4533, C04B41/4556 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1999/11] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Gegenstand auf der Basis von Zirkonoxid, seine Verwendung als verschleissbeständiges Armbanduhrenteil und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1998/27] | English: | Zirconia based article, its use as wear resistant part of a wristwatch and method for its production | [1998/27] | French: | Article à base de zircone, utilisation comme élément d'habillement, résistant à l'usure pour une montre-bracelet d'un tel article et procédé d'obtention d'un tel article | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 04.01.1999 | Examination requested [1999/10] | 22.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JPH02167875 ; | [AY]JPH02167857 ; | [XA]JPS58181766 ; | [YA]JPS5392376 ; | [A]JPS5798671 ; | [A]DE3812428 (KYOCERA CORP) | [DX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900917), vol. 014, no. 431, Database accession no. (C - 0759), & JP02167875 A 19900628 (TORAY IND INC) [DX] 1-3,7 * abstract * | [AY] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 90, no. 32, Database accession no. 90-242230, & JPH02167857 A 19900628 (TORAY) [A] 9 * abstract * [Y] 4,6 | [XA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 83, no. 48, Database accession no. 83-830509, XP002031841 & JPS58181766 A 19831024 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-3 * abstract * [A] 6,7 | [YA] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 78, no. 38, Database accession no. 78-6753A, XP002058734 & JPS5392376 A 19780814 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [Y] 4,6 * abstract * [A] 1 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 82, no. 30, Database accession no. 82-62489e, XP002031842 & JPS5798671 A 19820618 (SUWA SEIKOSHA KK) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - D.L.COCKE ET AL., APPLIED SURFACE SCIENCE, AMSTERDAM,NL, vol. 31, pages 471 - 476, XP002031840 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-4332(88)90009-8 |