EP0849182 - Device for folding and packaging a shirt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.1999 [1999/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Live from Milano S.r.l. Viale Col Di Lana, 6/a 20136 Milano / IT | [1998/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zanre, Alberto Via Colombo - Residenza Fontanile 211 20089 Basiglio (Milano) / IT | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Lunati, Vittoriano Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.l. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Lunati, Vittoriano LUNATI & MAZZONI S.a.s. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97122045.4 | 15.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI02650 | 18.12.1996 Original published format: IT MI962650 | [1998/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849182 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/00, B65D85/18 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
B65D85/182 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Falten und Packen eines Hemdes | [1998/26] | English: | Device for folding and packaging a shirt | [1998/26] | French: | DIspositif pour plier et emballer une chemise | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 25.12.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/49] | 24.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1999/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE8906024U (GUSTAV ALBERT GMBH) [A] 1,6,9* the whole document *; | [XA]US5154329 (DORFMUELLER DANIEL P [US]) [X] 13 * abstract * [A] 1,6,9; | [XPA]WO9728069 (CONTE MARIO [IT]) [XP] 11 * figure -; claims 1-3,6-8,11 * [A] 1-5 |