EP0848954 - Method for promoting ovulation and parturition in mammals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/26] | Method for promoting ovulation, parturition and lactation in mammals | ||
[2002/42] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2004 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 19.01.2005 [2005/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clemson University Sikes Hall Clemson South Carolina 29634 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states Clemson University Sikes Hall Clemson, South Carolina 29634 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cross, Dee L. 110 Central Road Central, South Carolina 29630 / US | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Bergmeier, Werner Canzler & Bergmeier Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84 85055 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Bergmeier, Werner, Dipl.-Ing. Beethovenstrasse 10 85101 Lenting / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122131.2 | 16.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | US19960768981 | 18.12.1996 Original published format: US 768981 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848954 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848954 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/445, A61P15/08 | [2002/42] | CPC: |
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A23K20/116 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61P15/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/26] | A61K31/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, LI [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Förderung von Ovulation und Geburt bei Säugetieren | [2002/42] | English: | Method for promoting ovulation and parturition in mammals | [2002/42] | French: | Méthode pour la stimulation de l'ovulation et de la parturition chez les mammifères | [2002/42] |
Former [1998/26] | Verfahren zur Förderung von Ovulation, Geburt und Milchbildung bei Säugetieren | ||
Former [1998/26] | Method for promoting ovulation, parturition and lactation in mammals | ||
Former [1998/26] | Méthode pour la stimulation de l'ovulation, de la parturition et de la lactation chez les mammifères | Examination procedure | 21.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 10.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.2003 | CH | 02.05.2003 | LI | 02.05.2003 | ES | 13.08.2003 | GB | 16.12.2003 | IE | 16.12.2003 | [2005/03] |
Former [2005/01] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
GB | 16.12.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 02.05.2003 | |
CH | 02.05.2003 | ||
LI | 02.05.2003 | ||
ES | 13.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 02.05.2003 | |
LI | 02.05.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4005211 (MARSBOOM ROBERT P H M) [X] 17-25 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0297191 (ILE DE FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-8,25 * page 2, line 1 - line 3; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]EP0368000 (ISRAEL OCEANOGRAPHIC & LIMNOLO [IL], et al) [Y] 1-25* page 5, column 35 - column 40 *; | [DX]US5372818 (CROSS DEE L [US], et al) [DX] 1-25 * column 1, line 20 - line 40 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 21 *; | [X] - PETRAGLIA F. ET AL, "Domperidone in defective and insufficient lactation", EUR. J. OBSTET. GYNECOL. REPROD. BIOL. (NETHERLANDS), (1985), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 281 - 287, XP002060660 [X] 17-25 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0028-2243(85)90042-5 | [Y] - DEAVER D.R. ET AL, "Effects of domperidone and thyrotropin-releasing hormone on secretion of luteinizing hormone and prolactin during luteal phase and following induction of luteal regression in sheep", DOMEST. ANIM. ENDOCRINOL. (UNITED STATES), (1987), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 95 - 102, XP002060661 [Y] 1-25 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0739-7240(87)90003-8 |