EP0856480 - Rail guided transport means and transport system with such transport means [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Denipro AG Tannenwiesenstrasse 5 8570 Weinfelden / CH | [2002/45] |
Former [1998/32] | For all designated states IPT Weinfelden AG Tannenwiesenstrasse 5 8570 Weinfelden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eberle, Jürg Bergstrasse 7 8340 Hinwil / CH | [1998/32] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1998/32] | Patentanwälte Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 97122136.1 | 16.12.1997 | [1998/32] | Priority number, date | CH19970000221 | 31.01.1997 Original published format: CH 22197 | [1998/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0856480 | Date: | 05.08.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0856480 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B65G9/00 | [1998/32] | CPC: |
B65G9/002 (EP,US);
B65G9/008 (EP,US);
B65H29/003 (EP,US);
B65H2405/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/16] |
Former [1998/32] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Schienengeführtes Transportmittel und Transportanlage mit derartigen Transportmitteln | [1998/32] | English: | Rail guided transport means and transport system with such transport means | [1998/32] | French: | Moyen de transport guidé sur rails et système de transport avec un tel moyen de transport | [1998/32] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 06.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3155051 (SHERBURNE PHILIP C) [A] 4 * figure 2 *; | [A]US3696890 (ARMSTRONG GILBERT) [A] 1 * figures 4,6 *; | [A]FR2458213 (BRICCA GIANFRANCO) [A] 1 * figures 1-9 *; | [A]FR2502106 (MAC GREGOR INTERNATIONAL SA [CH]) [A] 1 * page 5; figures 2-8 *; | [A]US4351241 (BREMS JOHN H, et al) [A] 4* figure 2 * | by applicant | CH382768 |