EP0849811 - Apparatus for forming non-single-crystal semiconductor thin film, method for forming non-single-crystal semiconductor thin film, and method for producing photovoltaic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [2007/49] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hori, Tadashi Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Okabe, Shotaro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Sakai, Akira Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kohda, Yuzo Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Yajima, Takahiro Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122196.5 | 16.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960353512 | 17.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35351296 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0849811 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0849811 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849811 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/20, H01L31/075, H01L21/205, C23C16/24 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
C23C16/545 (EP,US);
H01L31/20 (KR);
C23C14/562 (EP,US);
G03G5/08 (KR);
H01L21/0237 (EP,US);
H01L21/0243 (EP,US);
H01L21/02447 (EP,US);
H01L21/0245 (EP,US);
H01L21/02505 (EP,US);
H01L21/02529 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02576 (EP,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L21/205 (KR);
H01L31/075 (EP,US);
H01L31/202 (EP,US);
H01L31/204 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/05] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Apparat zur Herstellung einer nicht-monokristallinen Halbleiter-Dünnschicht, Herstellungsverfahren für eine nicht-monokristalline Halbleiter-Dünnschicht und Herstellungsverfahren für eine photovoltaische Vorrichtung | [1998/26] | English: | Apparatus for forming non-single-crystal semiconductor thin film, method for forming non-single-crystal semiconductor thin film, and method for producing photovoltaic device | [1998/26] | French: | Appareil de fabrication d'une couche semiconductrice non-monocristalline, méthode de fabrication d'une couche semiconductrice non-monocristalline et méthode de fabrication d'un dispositif photovoltaique | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 28.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 02.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.12.2007 | GB | 05.03.2008 | [2009/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6436085 ; | [A]EP0406691 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,7,13,14 * page 35, line 25 - line 36; figures 1,12 *; | [A]EP0574178 (SAKAE ELECTRONICS IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,7 * figure 1 *; | [A]US4960488 (LAW KAM S [US], et al) [A] 4,5,7-11 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 57; figure 3 *; | [A]EP0106521 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]) [A] 4,7,10,13 * figure 2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890526), vol. 013, no. 230, Database accession no. (E - 764), & JP01036085 A 19890207 (CANON INC) [A] 1,7,13 * abstract * |