EP0849253 - Process for producing benzoyl chlorides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.05.2002 [2002/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-Ku Tokyo 100-0005 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koshikawa, Takeshi, Corporate Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp., Inc., 22 Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Toshihiro Corporate Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp., Inc., 22 Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | 03 /
Takagawa, Makoto, Corporate Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chem. Comp., Inc., 22 Wadai Tsukuba-shi, Ibaraki-ken / JP | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122277.3 | 17.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960341438 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34143896 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849253 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849253 | Date: | 16.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/58, C07C63/10, C07C63/04 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
C07C51/58 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/58, C07C63/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/58, C07C63/10 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Benzoylchloriden | [1998/26] | English: | Process for producing benzoyl chlorides | [1998/26] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de chlorures de benzoyle | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 11.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/06] | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1039053 (SOLVAY WERKE GMBH) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]BE647037 (FARBENFABRIKEN BAYER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3274242 (ETHERINGTON JR ROBERT W, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]FR2228049 (STAMICARBON [NL]) [DA] 1* claim - *; | [DA]EP0723950 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [DA] 1-3,6 * the whole document * |