EP0923890 - Bracelet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1999/25] | Link for bracelet | ||
[2002/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.10.2003 [2003/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Swatch Group Management Services AG Seevorstadt 6 2501 Biel / CH | [1999/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pantet, Laurent Chemin de la Tour 2518 Nods / CH | [1999/25] | Representative(s) | Barbeaux, Bernard, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Rue des Sors 7 2074 Marin / CH | [1999/25] | Application number, filing date | 97122360.7 | 18.12.1997 | [1999/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0923890 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0923890 | Date: | 30.10.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A44C5/00, A44C5/10 | [1999/25] | CPC: |
A44C5/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2000/09] |
Former [1999/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Armband | [2002/26] | English: | Bracelet | [2002/26] | French: | Bracelet | [2002/26] |
Former [1999/25] | Glieder für Armband | ||
Former [1999/25] | Link for bracelet | ||
Former [1999/25] | Maillon de bracelet | Examination procedure | 23.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/09] | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE8534115U (U. REIF) [AD] 1,3 * page 8, paragraph L - page 10, paragraph 4; figures 1-7 *; | [A]CH675670 (BONNET DESIGN & TECHNOLOGY) [A] 1,4 * the whole document * |