Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] |
28.12.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
17.12.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.12.2004 | Definitive list of designations | published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
10.07.2004 | First examination report | |
02.07.2004 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
11.06.2004 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.07.2004 [2004/31] |
26.03.2004 | Publication of search report | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
26.03.2004 | Change - classification | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
20.01.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2002 | Renewal fee | |
15.03.2002 | Change - representative | published on 02.05.2002 [2002/18] |
04.01.2002 | Renewal fee | |
27.12.2000 | Renewal fee | |
28.01.2000 | Change - representative | published on 15.03.2000 [2000/11] |
27.12.1999 | Renewal fee | |
22.05.1998 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.07.1998 [1998/28] |