EP0852451 - Hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2005 [2005/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Audiologische Technik GmbH Gebbertstrasse 125 91058 Erlangen / DE | [1998/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ach-Kowalewski, Gerhard Erlanger Strasse 6 91090 Effeltrich / DE | 02 /
Husung, Kunibert, Dipl Ing.(TH) Schenkstrasse 67 91052 Erlangen / DE | 03 /
Knapp, Benno, Dipl. Ing. (FH) Reinschartenweg 6 91056 Erlangen / DE | [1998/28] | Representative(s) | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/18] | Berg, Peter, et al European Patent Attorney, Siemens AG, Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2000/11] | Zedlitz, Peter, et al Patentanwalt, Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/28] | Epping, Wilhelm, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwalt Postfach 22 13 17 80503 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122414.2 | 18.12.1997 | [1998/28] | Priority number, date | DE1997100052 | 02.01.1997 Original published format: DE 19700052 | [1998/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0852451 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0852451 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H05K1/02 | [2004/20] | CPC: |
H04R25/00 (EP);
H05K1/0218 (EP);
H04R2225/49 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/28] | H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, LI, NL [2005/05] |
Former [1998/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hörhilfegerät | [1998/28] | English: | Hearing aid | [1998/28] | French: | Prothèse auditive | [1998/28] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2004 | Examination requested [2004/31] | 07.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/20] | 22.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0271692 (SIEMENS AG) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 8, line 37 - line 54; figure 8; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9631107 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M ;BODAHL JOHNSEN HELGE (SE); TIMGREN MATS O) [Y] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH07263871 ; | [DA]EP0183936 (CONTRAVES AG) [DA] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 1996, no. 02, & JP07263871 A 19951013 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |