EP0853205 - Improved spring diaphragm for shut-off valves and regulators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2004 [2004/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raphael Valves Industries (1975) Ltd. P.O. Box 555 Or Akiva 30600 / IL | [2004/01] |
Former [2003/15] | For all designated states Raphael Valves Industries (1975) Ltd. 23 Hamelacha Street Or Akiva 30600 / IL | ||
Former [1998/29] | For all designated states Raphael Valves Industries (1975) Ltd. 23 Hamelacha Street Holon / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frenkel, Boris, Dr. 4 Etzel Street Netanya 42320 / IL | [2003/05] |
Former [1998/36] | 01 /
Frankel, Boris, Dr. 4 Etzel Street Netanya 42320 / IL | ||
Former [1998/29] | 01 /
Frankel, Boris, Dr. c/o Raphael Valves Ind. (1975) Ltd. 23 Hamelacha Street, Holon / IL | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/29] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122430.8 | 18.12.1997 | [1998/29] | Priority number, date | IL19970119963 | 05.01.1997 Original published format: IL 11996397 | [1998/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0853205 | Date: | 15.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0853205 | Date: | 09.12.1998 | [1998/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0853205 | Date: | 09.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F16K7/12 | [1998/29] | CPC: |
F16K7/126 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7762 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GR, IT [1999/39] |
Former [1999/33] | DE, ES, FR, GR, IT | ||
Former [1998/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Federmembran für Absperrventile und Regler | [1998/29] | English: | Improved spring diaphragm for shut-off valves and regulators | [1998/29] | French: | Membrane à ressort pour des soupapes d'arrêt et des régulateurs | [1998/29] | Examination procedure | 17.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/28] | 01.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US2302930 (ANDERSON HARRY J) [DA] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2710629 (HECTOR PRICE RICHARD) [A] 1 * figures 12,13 * * column 1, line 43 - line 47 *; | [A]US2840339 (HECTOR PRICE RICHARD) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 15 - line 20 * * column 2, line 31 - line 33 *; | [A]GB2031122 (MERSCH FONDERIES ATEL) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US2302930 | - FLUID CONTROLLING DIAPHRAGM VALV, ENGLAND, vol. 34131, page 7/16 |