EP0850769 - Method of compensating for output variations in a printing head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8551 / JP | ||
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kamimura, Katsuya, c/o Oki Data Corporation 11-22, Shibaura 4-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108 / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Böck, Bernhard advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstrasse 4 80538 München / DE | [2008/28] |
Former [2007/28] | Böck, Bernhard Böck, Tappe, v.d. Steinen, Weigand Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/27] | Kirschner, Klaus Dieter, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Sollner Strasse 38 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122453.0 | 18.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960344064 | 24.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34406496 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0850769 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0850769 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | [2001/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850769 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/447, G06K15/12 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
H04N1/4005 (EP,US);
B41J2/45 (EP,US);
G06K15/1247 (EP,US);
H04N1/40031 (EP,US);
H04N1/4015 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/27] | B41J2/447 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/43] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kompensationsverfahren für Outputvariationen für einen Druckkopf | [1998/27] | English: | Method of compensating for output variations in a printing head | [1998/27] | French: | Méthode de compensation de variations output pour une tête d'impression | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 24.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 21.07.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2007 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.01.2007 | 09.01.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 16.01.2007 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 31.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4941004 (PHAM HIEU T [US], et al) [A] 6,17,33,36* column 7, line 55 - column 8, line 33 *; | [XA]US5200765 (TAI HWAI-TZUU [US]) [X] 1,7,23,25,28,30,33-35 * column 10, line 1 - column 12, line 7; figure 2 * [A] 10,17; | [XA]EP0629974 (XEIKON NV [BE]) [X] 1,7-9,23,25-28,30-35,37,38 * column 2, line 17 - column 5, line 16; figure 3 * * column 14, line 3 - column 18, line 38 * [A] 10,17 |