blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0849692

EP0849692 - Method and apparatus for automatic sending of E-mail and automatic sending control program supplying medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  15.05.2009
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.05.2009Refusal of applicationpublished on 17.06.2009  [2009/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sony Communication Network Corporation
4-7-35, Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo 140-0001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2002/37]For all designated states
Sony Communication Network Corporation
4-7-35, Kitashinagawa
Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 140-0001 / JP
Former [1998/26]For all designated states
SONY CORPORATION
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hachiya, Kazuhiko
31-6, Nishigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Koki, Takashi
2-2, Kandasurugadai, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Kitamura, Michio c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Otaki, Namie c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome
Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP
[1998/30]
Former [1998/26]01 / Hachiya, Kazuhiko
31-6, Nishigotanda 5-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
02 / Koki, Takashi
2-2, Kandasurugadai, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Kitamura, Michio c/o Sony Corporation
7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku
Tokyo / JP
04 / Otaki, Namie
4-7-403, Ebisuminami 1-chome, Shibuya-ku
Tokyo / JP
Representative(s)Melzer, Wolfgang, et al
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 33 06 09
80066 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date97122454.818.12.1997
[1998/26]
Priority number, dateJP1996035504820.12.1996         Original published format: JP 35504896
JP1997016663809.06.1997         Original published format: JP 16663897
[1998/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0849692
Date:24.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0849692
Date:01.03.2000
[2000/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.01.2000
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/60, G06F9/44, G06F3/023
[2000/08]
CPC:
G06Q10/107 (EP,KR,US); G06F3/04812 (KR); G06F3/04815 (KR);
G06F3/0482 (KR)
Former IPC [1998/26]G06F17/60, G06F3/023, G06F3/033
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/45]
Former [1998/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum automatischen Senden elektronischer Post und Steuerprogrammaufzeichnungsmedium dafür[1998/26]
English:Method and apparatus for automatic sending of E-mail and automatic sending control program supplying medium[1998/26]
French:Méthode et dispositif pour la transmission automatique de courrier électronique et support de programme de contrôle associé[1998/26]
Examination procedure19.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
15.11.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.2009Application refused, date of legal effect [2009/25]
13.01.2009Date of oral proceedings
03.02.2009Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2009/25]
03.02.2009Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP00124923.4  / EP1091306
EP05018699.8  / EP1659522
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.03.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 09
29.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 10
27.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 11
30.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200408   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2005
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[PX]JPH09138767  ;
 [PX]JPH09149398  ;
 [DY]JPH05274233  ;
 [Y]EP0691609  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [Y] 1-35 * column 5, line 3 - column 14, line 59 *;
 [A]EP0626635  (FIRSTPERSON INC [US]) [A] 1-35 * column 2, line 34 - column 3, line 13 * * column 19, line 34 - column 20, line 1 * * column 32, line 6 - column 33, line 35 *;
 [A]JPH06259345  ;
 [A]EP0697671  (SHARP KK [JP]) [A] 1-35 * abstract *;
 [DA]US5347628  (BREWER SUSAN C [US], et al) [DA] 1-35 * abstract *
 [X]  - INOUE T ET AL, "Evaluations of gestural animations to convey feelings in asynchronous network communication", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 4963309, XP002125465 [X] 1-35 * abstract *
    [ ] - PROCEEDINGS ISADS 95. SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON AUTONOMOUS DECENTRALIZED SYSTEMS (CAT. NO.95TH8073), PROCEEDINGS ISADS 95. SECOND INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON AUTONOMOUS DECENTRALIZED SYSTEMS, PHOENIX, AZ, USA, 25-27 APRIL 1995, 1995, Los Alamitos, CA, USA, IEEE Comput. Soc. Press, USA, ISBN 0-8186-7087-8, pages 227 - 234 [ ] * Section 5: "Application to electronic mail" *; page 230 - page 233 *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09138767 A 19970527 (FUJITSU TEN LTD) [PX] 1-35 * abstract *
 [PX]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, & JP09149398 A 19970606 (HITACHI LTD) [PX] 1-35 * abstract *
 [DY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940126), vol. 018, no. 050, Database accession no. (P - 1683), & JP05274233 A 19931022 (SONY CORP) [DY] 1-35 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941213), vol. 018, no. 659, Database accession no. (P - 1843), & JP06259345 A 19940916 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-35 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.