EP0850802 - A device for varying the attitude of the front headlamps of motor vehicles, particularly motor cars [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [1998/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andronaco, Carmelo Via Rivalta, 7 10040 Volvera (Torino) / IT | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Serra, Francesco, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia, 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Serra, Francesco, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97122488.6 | 19.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO01088 | 27.12.1996 Original published format: IT TO961088 | [1998/27] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0850802 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0850802 | Date: | 02.06.1999 | [1999/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/076 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
B60Q1/076 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/07] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Veränderungseinrichtung von der Neigung von Kraftfahrzeugscheinwerfern | [1998/27] | English: | A device for varying the attitude of the front headlamps of motor vehicles, particularly motor cars | [1998/27] | French: | Dispositif de changement de l'inclinaison des phares d'un véhicule | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/33] | 20.03.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.01.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.01.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.01.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0171318 (MANZONI) [X] 1-4 * page 10, line 20 - line 30; figure 14; claim 11 *; | [X]EP0430760 (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE) [X] 1-4 * column 5, line 42 - column 6, line 33; figure 3 *; | [A]FR2620529 (NEIMAN) [A] 1-4 * figures 6,11,12; claims 1-5 * |