Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0850802 | Global Dossier | 02.06.1999 | A3 | EP0850802 | 01.07.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | ITTO961088 | 27.12.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1289808 | 16.10.1998 | B1 | ITTO961088 | 27.06.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | ITTO961088 | 27.12.1996 |