EP0849339 - Water-soluble coloured lead or coloured chalk and method for preparing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2001 [2001/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states A.W. Faber- Castell Unternehmensverwaltung GmbH & Co. Nürnberger Strasse 2 90547 Stein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states A.W. Faber- Castell Unternehmensverwaltung GmbH & Co. Nürnberger Strasse 2 D-90547 Stein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lugert, Gerhard, Dr. Hartungstrasse 65b 90431 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
Appel, Reiner Herriedener Strasse 17 90494 Nürnberg / DE | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Mörtel, Alfred, et al Mörtel & Höfner Äussere Sulzbacher Strasse 159/161 90491 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Mörtel, Alfred, et al Mörtel & Höfner Blumenstrasse 1 90402 Nürnberg / DE | ||
Former [1998/26] | Tergau, Enno, Dipl.-Ing., et al Mögeldorfer Hauptstrasse 51 90482 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122614.7 | 22.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | DE1996153926 | 21.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19653926 | [1998/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849339 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849339 | Date: | 03.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D13/00, B43K19/00 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
C09D13/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserlösliche Farbmine oder Farbkreide und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1998/26] | English: | Water-soluble coloured lead or coloured chalk and method for preparing the same | [1998/26] | French: | Mine de couleur et craie de couleur solubles dans l'eau et son procédé de préparation | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 22.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 28.12.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.05.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 01.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.03.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.03.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3421408 (JOHANN FROESCHEIS LYRA BLEISTI [DE]) [A] 1,7-9 * claims 1,7,8 *; | [A]GB2255318 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO [JP]) [A] 1,2,7,8 * claims 1,4,5,8 *; | [A]DE4230793 (KRUPP BELLAFORM MASCHBAU [DE]) [A] 9,11,13,14* claims 1,2,6,7 * |