EP0850815 - Vehicular brake system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho, Kariya-City Aichi-pref., 448 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-City Aichi-Pref. 448 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abe, Youichi, c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intel. Prop. Dept., 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-pref. 448 / JP | 02 /
Yonemura, Shuichi, c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intel. Prop. Dept., 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-pref. 448 / JP | [2002/22] |
Former [1998/27] | 01 /
Abe, Yonichi, c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intel. Prop. Dept., 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-pref. 448 / JP | ||
02 /
Yonemura, Shuichi, c/o DENSO CORPORATION Intel. Prop. Dept., 1-1 Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-pref. 448 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | KUHNEN, WACKER & PARTNER Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122815.0 | 23.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960350807 | 27.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35080796 | JP19970146845 | 04.06.1997 Original published format: JP 14684597 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0850815 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850815 | Date: | 09.10.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/52, B60T7/12, B60T11/10 | [1998/27] | CPC: |
B60T11/105 (EP,US);
B60T13/52 (EP,US);
B60T13/686 (EP,US);
B60T17/18 (EP,US);
B60T7/12 (EP,US);
B60T8/3275 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/11] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugbremssystem | [1998/27] | English: | Vehicular brake system | [1998/27] | French: | Système de freinage pour véhicule | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 09.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/45] | 04.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP00122443.5 / EP1067032 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1259421 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1,8-11 * column W *; | [A]DE3518288 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,8-11 * abstract *; | [A]WO8901887 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,8-11 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 8 * | Examination | JPH08295231 |