EP0851638 - Communication method and receiving apparatus for OFDM system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2006 [2006/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Mitsuhiro c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Sakoda, Kazuyuki c/o Sony Corporation, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Melzer, Wolfgang, et al Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/27] | Melzer, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner, Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122845.7 | 23.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960348805 | 26.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34880596 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0851638 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0851638 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | [2001/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H04L27/2656 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2657 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2679 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/27] | H04L27/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FI, FR, GB, NL [2001/50] |
Former [1998/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Empfangsverfahren und Empfangsgerät für OFDM-System | [1998/27] | English: | Communication method and receiving apparatus for OFDM system | [1998/27] | French: | Méthode de réception et appareil récepteur pour système MDFO | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 26.07.2001 | Examination requested [2001/39] | 13.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/29] | 01.03.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US5029184 (ANDREN CARL F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * column 6, line 14 - line 26 * * column 6, line 39 - line 44 * * column 7, line 35 - line 51 * * column 7, line 52 - line 57 * * column 8, line 30 - line 38 * * column 8, line 46 - line 53 * * column 9, line 41 - line 55 * * column 10, line 43 - line 47 * * figures 2,5 * [A] 4,8 [Y] 3,7; | [XAY]EP0681190 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) [X] 2,4,6,8 * page 6, line 30 - line 31 * * page 6, line 44 - line 47 * * page 7, line 16 - line 19 * * page 6, line 22 - line 23 * * figures 5-8 * [A] 1,5 [Y] 3,7; | [A]EP0719004 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,5,6 * column 14, line 34 - line 55 * * column 16, line 10 - line 23 ** figure 9 * |