EP0850672 - LCD game machine and ROM cartridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai 5-4, 2-chome, Komagata Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Bandai 5-4, 2-chome, Komagata Taito-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/27] | For all designated states Koto Co., Ltd. No. 325, Niohmon Tsukinuke-cho, Kurumayachodori Nijoh Sagaru Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yokoi, Gumpei, c/o Koto Co., Ltd., Nr 325, Niohmon Tsukinuke-cho, Kurumayachodori Nijoh Sagaru Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Suga, Issei Nr.6-3, Shichiku Higashi Momonomoto-cho, Kita-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 03 /
Kazeto, Kousei, c/o Koto Co., Ltd., Nr.325 Niohmon Tsukinuke-cho, Kurumayachodori Nijoh Sagaru Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | 04 /
Kakuda, Noriyasu, c/o Koto Co., Ltd., Nr325, Niohmon Tsukinuke-cho, Kurumayachodori Nijoh Sagaru Nakagyo-ku, Kyoto-shi, Kyoto / JP | [1998/27] | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/42] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/48] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, Dr. Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/27] | Jaeger, Klaus, Dr., et al Jaeger, Böck & Köster, Patentanwälte, Pippinplatz 4a D-82131 Gauting / DE | Application number, filing date | 97122952.1 | 29.12.1997 | [1998/27] | Priority number, date | JP19960358198 | 27.12.1996 Original published format: JP 35819896 | JP19970327134 | 11.11.1997 Original published format: JP 32713497 | [1998/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0850672 | Date: | 01.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0850672 | Date: | 01.12.1999 | [1999/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0850672 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/00 | [2004/13] | CPC: |
A63F13/06 (EP);
A63F13/92 (US);
A63F13/08 (EP);
A63F13/20 (EP);
A63F13/22 (US);
A63F13/42 (US);
|
Former IPC [1998/27] | A63F9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/27] | Extension states | AL | 02.06.2000 | LT | 02.06.2000 | LV | 02.06.2000 | MK | 02.06.2000 | RO | 02.06.2000 | SI | 02.06.2000 | Title | German: | Spielvorrichtung mit Flüssigkeitskristallanzeige und Festwertspeichermodul | [1998/27] | English: | LCD game machine and ROM cartridge | [1998/27] | French: | Dispositif de jeu avec écran à cristaux liquides et cartouche de mémoire ROM | [1998/27] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/30] | 30.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 10.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2004 | BE | 13.10.2004 | CH | 13.10.2004 | FI | 13.10.2004 | FR | 13.10.2004 | IT | 13.10.2004 | LI | 13.10.2004 | NL | 13.10.2004 | SE | 13.10.2004 | LU | 29.12.2004 | IE | 30.12.2004 | MC | 31.12.2004 | DK | 13.01.2005 | GR | 13.01.2005 | DE | 14.01.2005 | ES | 24.01.2005 | PT | 13.03.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
SE | 13.10.2004 | ||
LU | 29.12.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
DE | 14.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/32] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
FR | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
DE | 14.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
DE | 14.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
NL | 13.10.2004 | ||
IE | 30.12.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
DE | 14.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
BE | 13.10.2004 | ||
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
DK | 13.01.2005 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.12.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/36] | AT | 13.10.2004 | |
CH | 13.10.2004 | ||
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
ES | 24.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
GR | 13.01.2005 | ||
Former [2005/25] | CH | 13.10.2004 | |
FI | 13.10.2004 | ||
LI | 13.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 13.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2226768 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,13,16 * page 6, line 1 - page 9, line 19 ** page 12, line 25 - page 14, line 2 *; | [A]US4969647 (MICAL ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-4,8,9 * column 3, line 4 - column 6, line 65 *; | [A]US5276831 (NAKANISHI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 12 * claims 1-5,12 * |