EP0852257 - Process for decolouring a cracked distillate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.05.1999 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.1999 | Refusal of application | published on 07.07.1999 [1999/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/28] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smeets, Theodorus Maria Burg, Eussenstraat 6 6181 BP Stein (L.) / NL | [1998/28] | Application number, filing date | 97200007.9 | 02.01.1997 | [1998/28] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0852257 | Date: | 08.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C10G17/04, C10G70/00, C08F240/00 | [1998/28] | CPC: |
C10G17/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [1999/12] |
Former [1998/28] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Entfärben von Krackdestillat | [1998/28] | English: | Process for decolouring a cracked distillate | [1998/28] | French: | Procédé de décoloration de distillats craqués | [1998/28] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1997 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 02.01.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 28.04.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 27.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 08.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1999/27] | 18.02.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1999/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.02.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.02.1999 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US3763015 (MORIMOTO H, et al) [DY] 1-6 * column W *; | [DY]EP0233074 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [DY] 1-6 * claim 17 * | by applicant | EP0233074 | NL7109804 | US4276396 | JPS6128508 | JPH04335014 | WO9512623 |