EP0785395 - Liquid hydrocarbon burner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2002 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FONDERIES DU LION S.A. Route Axiale 5 B-5660 Frasnes-lez-Couvin / BE | For all designated states Thermic Investments Boulevard Royal 4, BP 758 2017 Luxembourg / LU | [1998/27] |
Former [1997/30] | For all designated states FONDERIES DU LION S.A. Route Axiale 5 B-5660 Frasnes-lez-Couvin / BE | ||
For all designated states NESTOR MARTIN S.A. Rue de la Technologie 47-49 B-1080 Bruxelles / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berlaimont, Claude Rue F. Dive 31A 5060 Falisolle / BE | 02 /
Champion, Raymond Rue de la Marcelle 28 5660 Couvin / BE | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Van Malderen, Michel, et al Office van Malderen 85/043 Boulevard de la Sauvenière 4000 Liège / BE | ||
Former [1997/30] | Pieraerts, Jacques, et al GEVERS Patents, Brussels Airport Business Park, Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 97200102.8 | 15.01.1997 | [1997/30] | Priority number, date | BE19960000044 | 18.01.1996 Original published format: BE 9600044 | [1997/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0785395 | Date: | 23.07.1997 | Language: | FR | [1997/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0785395 | Date: | 25.11.1998 | [1998/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F23D5/12, F24C3/00 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
F23C13/08 (EP,US);
F23D5/126 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1997/30] | F23D5/12 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, NL, PT [1997/30] | Title | German: | Brenner für flüssigen Kohlenwasserstoff | [1997/30] | English: | Liquid hydrocarbon burner | [1997/30] | French: | Brûleur à hydrocarbure liquide | [1997/30] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/25] | 19.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/20] | 04.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.02.1999 | 31.01.2002 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB655128 (SPEEDFIRE OIL BURNERS LTD) [Y] 9,12 * page 1, line 9 - line 26 * * page 2, line 20 - line 30 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US3925001 (SALOOJA KAILISH CHANDER) [Y] 2-4 * column 1, line 5 - line 14 * * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 35 *; | [XY]FR2289846 (FOND FRANCO BELGES [FR]) [X] 1,8,10 * page 1, line 27 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 22 - line 24 * * page 4, line 33 - line 36 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-5,9,11,12; | [Y]FR2308054 (FOND FRANCO BELGES [FR]) [Y] 11 * page 1, line 29 - page 2, line 17 * * page 3, line 19 - line 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4388892 (RODY MARC P N [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 44 - line 64 *; | [A]EP0500176 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL]) [A] 13 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 1, line 30 - line 40 ** page 2, line 44 - line 49 *; | [A]EP0692673 (FOND FRANCO BELGES [FR]) [A] 6 * page 4, line 2 - line 7 * * page 2, line 18 - line 31 * * page 4, line 46 - line 53 * |