Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0789481 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2004 | B1 | EP0789481 | 24.09.1997 | A3 | EP0789481 | 13.08.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP96200273 | 08.02.1996 | EP97200268 | 31.01.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5818065 | 06.10.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US1455596 | 03.04.1996 | EP96200273 | 08.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2905166B | Global Dossier | 14.06.1999 | B2 | JPH09329855 | 22.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | EP96200273 | 08.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69728461T | 03.03.2005 | T2 | DE69728461D1 | 13.05.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP96200273 | 08.02.1996 |