EP0794589 - Vehicle window with antenna connection apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | For all designated states DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION (a Delaware corp.) 700 East Firmin Street Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | ||
For all designated states DELCO ELECTRONICS CORPORATION (a Delaware corp.) 700 East Firmin Street Kokomo, Indiana 46902 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagy, Louis Leonard 2528 Irma Warren, Michigan 48092 / US | 02 /
Martin, Douglas Courtney 27115 Warner Warren, Michigan 48092 / US | 03 /
Lewis, Michael Jerome 24105 Pierce Southfield, Michigan 48075 / US | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/31] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/37] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97200390.9 | 12.02.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | US19960610656 | 04.03.1996 Original published format: US 610656 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794589 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794589 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | [1999/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794589 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/12, H01Q1/32 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10174 (EP,US);
B32B17/10293 (EP,US);
B32B17/10302 (EP,US);
H01Q1/1271 (EP,US);
H01Q13/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/37] | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeugscheibe mit Antennenverbindungsanordnung | [1997/37] | English: | Vehicle window with antenna connection apparatus | [1997/37] | French: | Vitre de véhicule avec dispositif de liaison d'antenne | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1999 | Examination requested [1999/37] | 25.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.05.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 28.07.2004 | DE | 29.10.2004 | GB | 12.02.2005 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/13] | DE | 29.10.2004 | |
GB | 12.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/03] | DE | 29.10.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3755066 (ROSE A) [A] 1,2 * column 4, line 61 - column 6, line 26; figure 2 *; | [A]US3810180 (KUNERT H, et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 2; figure 9 *; | [A]US4768037 (INABA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1* column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 57; figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO8809712 (TEROSON GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,2 * example 1 *; | [A]US5005020 (OGAWA MASANOBU [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 6, lines 20-34; figure 9 *; | [E]EP0763869 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [E] 1,2 * column 5, lines 1-27; figures 1-3 *; | [E]EP0780927 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [E] 1,2 * column 3, line 48 - column 8, line 32; figures 2-4 * |