EP0793183 - Programmable options for volume mount on a computing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2000 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.11.2000 [2000/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road, M/S Palo 1-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/24] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 901 San Antonio Road, MS PAL01-521 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | ||
Former [1997/36] | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue, MS PAL1-521 Mountain View, California 94043-1100 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Duncan, William L. 1030 Hidden Valley Road Colorado Springs, CO 80919 / US | [1997/36] | Representative(s) | Hanna, Peter William Derek Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/36] | Hanna, Peter William Derek Tomkins & Co., 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 97200519.3 | 22.02.1997 | [1997/36] | Priority number, date | US19960608756 | 29.02.1996 Original published format: US 608756 | [1997/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0793183 | Date: | 03.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0793183 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06F3/06 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
G06F16/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1997/36] | Title | German: | Programmierbare Optionen zum Einhängen von Datenträgern in einem Rechnersystem | [1997/36] | English: | Programmable options for volume mount on a computing system | [1997/36] | French: | Options programmables pour monter des volumes dans un système informatique | [1997/36] | Examination procedure | 03.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 03.11.1997 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.1998 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 02.06.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0415346 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1,6 * page 11, line 32 - page 12, line 33 * * page 21, line 1 - page 23, line 43 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Method to Manage Network Machine Start-Ups", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, NEW YORK, US, (198901), vol. 31, no. 8, pages 182 - 184, XP000024057 [A] 1,6 * abstract * |