EP0794042 - Method for manufacturing a composite girder and so manufactured girder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITALCEMENTI S.p.A. Via G. Camozzi, 124 24100 Bergamo / IT | For all designated states Gipieffe Architettura Studio Associato Corso Garibaldi, 94 47100 Forli / IT | [1997/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Collina, Vincenzo Via Scaletta, 4 47100 Villagrappa (Forli) / IT | 02 /
Migliacci, Antonio Via Verrocchio, 30 20129 Milano / IT | 03 /
Guerrini, Gian Luca Viale Assunta, 78/B 20063 Cernusco Sul Naviglio (Milano) / IT | 04 /
Cassar, Luigi Via Europa, 42 20097 San Donato Milanese (Milano) / IT | [1997/37] | Representative(s) | Zanardo, Giovanni, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milan / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/37] | Zanardo, Giovanni, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A., Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 97200608.4 | 04.03.1997 | [1997/37] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI00426 | 05.03.1996 Original published format: IT MI960426 | [1997/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0794042 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0794042 | Date: | 23.06.1999 | [1999/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0794042 | Date: | 08.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B28B23/06 | [1997/37] | CPC: |
E04C3/294 (EP,US);
B28B23/06 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49634 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/37] | Extension states | AL | 04.03.1997 | LT | 04.03.1997 | LV | 04.03.1997 | RO | 04.03.1997 | SI | 04.03.1997 | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von einem Stahlbeton-Verbundbalken und so hergestellter Stahlbeton-Verbundbalken | [1997/37] | English: | Method for manufacturing a composite girder and so manufactured girder | [1997/37] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'une poutre mixte et poutre mixte ainsi obtenu | [1997/37] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1999 | Examination requested [1999/45] | 22.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2002 | CH | 08.05.2002 | FI | 08.05.2002 | LI | 08.05.2002 | NL | 08.05.2002 | DK | 08.08.2002 | PT | 08.08.2002 | SE | 08.08.2002 | DE | 09.08.2002 | [2004/40] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
DK | 08.08.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
DE | 09.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
DE | 09.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
PT | 08.08.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
CH | 08.05.2002 | ||
LI | 08.05.2002 | ||
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/10] | AT | 08.05.2002 | |
NL | 08.05.2002 | ||
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | NL | 08.05.2002 | |
SE | 08.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 08.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH03131556 ; | [Y]JPH02283650 ; | [AP]JPH08277507 ; | [A]JPH0510001 ; | [A]JPH05302398 ; | [Y]GB842739 (FELIX LOUIS JAMES SAMUELY) [Y] 1-10,12-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE2254908 (PREFLEX VERBUNDTRAEGER GMBH) [Y] 1-10,12-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]BE861444 (CERFONTAINE JACQUES E E) [Y] 1-10,12-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0534857 (SARET FRANCE [FR]) [Y] 5-8,14-17 * the whole document *; | [A]DE4328187 (MITSCHKE EKKEHART [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,4,10,12 * the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910829), vol. 015, no. 341, Database accession no. (C - 0863), & JP03131556 A 19910605 (NIPPON CEMENT CO LTD) [Y] 5-8,14-17 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910207), vol. 015, no. 052, Database accession no. (C - 0803), & JP02283650 A 19901121 (NIPPON CONCRETE IND CO LTD) [Y] 5-8,14-17 * abstract * | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970228), vol. 097, no. 002, & JP08277507 A 19961022 (P S CO LTD) [AP] 1-4,10,12,13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930531), vol. 017, no. 282, Database accession no. (M - 1420), & JP05010001 A 19930119 (ORIENTARU KENSETSU KK) [A] 1,3,4,10,12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940217), vol. 018, no. 098, Database accession no. (M - 1562), & JP05302398 A 19931116 (ORIENTAL KENSETSU KK) [A] 1,3,4,10,12 * abstract * |