Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0805059
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.06.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] |
15.06.2001 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] |
30.06.2000 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.08.2000 [2000/33] |
06.04.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.12.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
17.08.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
13.07.1999 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
27.05.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
09.04.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
05.02.1999 |
First examination report |
|
01.02.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.01.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.03.1999 [1999/09] |
08.01.1999 |
Change - representative |
published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] |
08.05.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.06.1998 [1998/26] |
19.09.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] |