Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0805059 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2000 | B1 | EP0805059 | 24.06.1998 | A3 | EP0805059 | 05.11.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US63866496 | 29.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69702806T | 07.12.2000 | T2 | DE69702806D1 | 21.09.2000 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US63866496 | 29.04.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5669842 | 23.09.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US63866496 | 29.04.1996 |