11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
21.03.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 07.05.2003 [2003/19] |
11.01.2003 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] |
27.09.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.11.2002 [2002/46] |
28.03.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.05.2002 [2002/20] |
07.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.02.2002 |
Change - designated states |
published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] |
30.11.2001 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
16.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
16.11.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
02.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
07.06.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
27.03.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.11.1999 |
First examination report |
|
23.11.1999 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.09.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.07.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] |
21.11.1997 |
Publication of search report |
published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] |
23.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.07.1997 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] |
18.07.1997 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.09.1997 [1997/36] |
04.07.1997 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.08.1997 [1997/34] |