EP0790122 - Screwpress and method for compaction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton, Robin Ashton Close Farm, Snelston Ashbourne Derbyshire DE6 2DL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | For all designated states Hamilton, Robin Ashton Close Farm, Snelston Ashbourne, Derbyshire DE6 2DL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/34] | Swindell & Pearson 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97200977.3 | 23.09.1993 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | GB19920020382 | 26.09.1992 Original published format: GB 9220382 | GB19930006462 | 29.03.1993 Original published format: GB 9306462 | [1997/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790122 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790122 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | [1998/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0790122 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B30B9/18, B30B9/14 | [1997/36] | CPC: |
B30B9/3082 (EP,US);
B30B11/225 (EP,US);
B30B11/246 (EP,US);
B30B11/248 (EP,US);
B30B9/121 (EP,US);
B30B9/18 (EP,US);
B30B9/3007 (EP,US);
B30B9/3025 (EP,US);
B30B9/3089 (EP,US);
E01H1/0863 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1997/34] | B30B9/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [2002/15] |
Former [1997/34] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Schneckenpresse und Verfahren zum Verdichten | [1997/34] | English: | Screwpress and method for compaction | [1997/34] | French: | Presse à vis et procédé de pressage | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 06.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/36] | 26.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93920992.0 / EP0662043 | Divisional application(s) | EP01204251.1 / EP1193045 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.05.2002 | NL | 15.05.2002 | SE | 15.08.2002 | [2008/07] |
Former [2003/09] | NL | 15.05.2002 | |
SE | 15.08.2002 | ||
Former [2002/46] | SE | 15.08.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8705619 (GNII KVARTSEVOGO STEKLA [SE]) [X] 1-8 * page 4, line 18 - page 6, line 5 * * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 9; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US5009795 (EICHLER DIETRICH [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 19 - line 32 * * column 3, line 5 - line 10 * * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 9; figure 1 *; | [X]US4520724 (COSTARELLI EDOARDO [IT]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 59 * * column 5, line 9 - line 28; figure 3 *; | [X]EP0019538 (ALSTHOM ATLANTIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-6,8 * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 15 * * page 3, line 4 - line 32; figures 1,2,4 *; | [X]US3065689 (JEAN GUEYTRON MAURICE) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column W *; | [A]EP0239858 (TETRA PAK AB [SE]) [A] 1-8 |