EP0802505 - High resolution diagnostic laser printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.04.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1997/43] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wojcik, Timothy John, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Krogstad, Robert Thompson, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Haile, Helen Cynthia, et al Kodak Limited Patent, W92-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1997/43] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited, Patent Departement (W92)-3A, Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 97200988.0 | 04.04.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | US19960633257 | 18.04.1996 Original published format: US 633257 | [1997/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0802505 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0802505 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802505 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/12, H04N1/00 | [1997/43] | CPC: |
H04N1/3935 (EP,US);
G06K15/1204 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/43] | Title | German: | Diagnoselaserdrucker mit hoher Auflösung | [2004/03] | English: | High resolution diagnostic laser printer | [1997/43] | French: | Imprimante laser de diagnostic à haute résolution | [1997/43] |
Former [1997/43] | Diagnoselaserdrucker mit hoher Verdichtung | Examination procedure | 18.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 04.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.03.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2244832 (GEN SCANNING INC [US]); | [Y]WO9210052 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 10, line 26 - page 11, line 13 * * page 17, line 20 - page 19, line 13 * * page 37, line 8 - line 19; claim - * * page 52, line 13 - page 53, line 21 *; | [A]US5193008 (FRAZIER ALLEN L [US], et al); | [Y]WO9607268 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, line 6 - page 4, line 6 * * page 12, line 4 - page 18, line 13; claim - * |