EP0802538 - Video server [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2009/47] |
Former [2008/39] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2003/20] | For:DE
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Steindamm 94 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2002/40] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1997/43] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmidt, Adam c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Hasenzahl, Markus c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1997/43] | Representative(s) | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/43] | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97200990.6 | 04.04.1997 | [1997/43] | Priority number, date | DE1996114157 | 10.04.1996 Original published format: DE 19614157 | [1997/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0802538 | Date: | 22.10.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0802538 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0802538 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/02, G11B27/00, H04N7/173 | [1997/47] | CPC: |
H04N7/17336 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1997/43] | G11B27/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/43] | Title | German: | Videoserver | [1997/43] | English: | Video server | [1997/43] | French: | Serveur vidéo | [1997/43] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 04.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0637890 (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0653885 (BELL TELEPHONE MFG [BE]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0832957 ; | [A]US5133079 (BALLANTYNE DOUGLAS J [CA], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, & JP08032957 A 19960202 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,2 * abstract * |