EP0808732 - Vehicle chassis system control method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/48] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Hsien Heng 4828 Seasons Drive Troy, Michigan 48098 / US | 02 /
Leaphart, Eldon Gerrald 23680 Oak Glen Drive Southfield, Michigan 48034 / US | 03 /
Bedner, Edward John 833 Fairway Trails Drive Brighton, Michigan 48116 / US | 04 /
Chin, Yuen-Kwok 5137 Serena Drive Troy, Michigan 48098 / US | [1997/48] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/29] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/28] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner Postfach 22 16 11 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [1997/48] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97201167.0 | 21.04.1997 | [1997/48] | Priority number, date | US19960660150 | 23.05.1996 Original published format: US 660150 | [1997/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0808732 | Date: | 26.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0808732 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B60G17/015, B60T8/00 | [1997/48] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60G17/0185 (EP,US);
B60G17/0195 (EP,US);
B60G2400/104 (EP,US);
B60G2400/208 (EP,US);
B60G2400/412 (EP,US);
B60G2600/02 (EP,US);
B60G2600/04 (EP,US);
B60G2600/08 (EP,US);
B60G2600/16 (EP,US);
B60G2600/70 (EP,US);
B60G2800/012 (EP,US);
B60G2800/21 (EP,US);
B60G2800/22 (EP,US);
B60G2800/24 (EP,US);
B60G2800/244 (EP,US);
B60G2800/246 (EP,US);
B60G2800/92 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät für das Fahrwerk-Regelungssystem eines Kraftfahrzeuges | [1997/48] | English: | Vehicle chassis system control method and apparatus | [1997/48] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour le système de commande d'un châssis de véhicule | [1997/48] | Examination procedure | 26.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 23.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH04135976 ; | [A]JPH05139327 ; | [A]JPH0840246 ; | [A]JPH0820324 ; | [A]US4695068 (KAWAMOTO YOSHIMICHI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0557692 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-6,9,11 * abstract *; | [A]DE4208000 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0682614 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [A] 1,9 * claims 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920826), vol. 016, no. 405, Database accession no. (M - 1301), & JP04135976 A 19920511 (AISIN SEIKI CO LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930922), vol. 017, no. 527, Database accession no. (M - 1484), & JP05139327 A 19930608 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960628), vol. 096, no. 006, & JP08040246 A 19960213 (HINO MOTORS LTD) [A] 1,9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960531), vol. 096, no. 005, & JP08020324 A 19960123 (TOKYO BUHIN KOGYO KK) [A] 1,9 * abstract * |