Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.02.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2002 [2002/13] |
18.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
15.05.2001 | Renewal fee | |
05.05.2001 | First examination report | |
02.05.2001 | Examination report or reply | |
13.10.2000 | Change - applicant | published on 29.11.2000 [2000/48] |
10.05.2000 | Renewal fee | |
02.07.1999 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.08.1999 [1999/33] |
14.05.1999 | Renewal fee | |
30.10.1998 | Publication of search report | published on 16.12.1998 [1998/51] |
23.10.1998 | Change - classification | published on 09.12.1998 [1998/50] |
10.10.1997 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] |