Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0808978 | Global Dossier | 16.12.1998 | A3 | EP0808978 | 26.11.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US65201796 | 21.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100209446B | 15.07.1999 | B1 | KR970075187 | 10.12.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US65201796 | 21.05.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5632517 | 27.05.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US65201796 | 21.05.1996 |