EP0881094 - A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2001 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/49] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Damme, Marc c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Vermeersch, Joan c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V. IIE 380, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [1998/49] | Application number, filing date | 97201559.8 | 27.05.1997 | [1998/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0881094 | Date: | 02.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0881094 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/36, B41C1/10 | [1998/49] | CPC: |
B41C1/1025 (EP);
B41M5/36 (EP);
B41C1/1008 (EP);
B41C2210/04 (EP);
B41C2210/06 (EP);
B41C2210/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1998/49] | Title | German: | Wärmeempfindliches Aufzeichnungselement und Verfahren zur Herstellung von Flachdruckplatten damit | [1998/49] | English: | A heat sensitive imaging element and a method for producing lithographic plates therewith | [1998/49] | French: | Elément d'enregistrement thermosensible et procédé pour la fabrication de plaques lithographiques utilisant cet élément | [1998/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/30] | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.04.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.10.2000 | [2002/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0678380 (PRESSTEK INC) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 1-13; | [Y]CH482551 (GEVAERT-AGFA N.V.) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS60201987 ; | [A]GB1208415 (GEVAERT-AGFA N.V.) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860305), vol. 010, no. 055, Database accession no. (M - 458), & JP60201987 A 19851012 (RICOH KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |