EP0803791 - Clock Generation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.2000 [2000/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited Planar House, Parkway, Globe Park Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics Limited Planar House, Parkway, Globe Park Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | ||
Former [1997/44] | For all designated states SGS-Thomson Microelectronics Limited Planar House, Parkway, Globe Park Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buckingham, Keith Basement Flat, 34 Abbotsford Road Cotham, Bristol BS6 6HB / GB | 02 /
Simpson, Robert John Top Flat, 36 Alexandra Park Redland, Bristol BS6 6QD / GB | [1997/47] |
Former [1997/44] | 01 /
Buckingham, Keith Basement Flat, 34 Abbotsford Road Cotham, Bristol BS6 6HB / GB | ||
02 /
Simpson, Robert John 5 Pool Corner Tockington, Bristol BS12 4NR / GB | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/44] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 97201653.9 | 26.06.1990 | [1997/44] | Priority number, date | GB19890015583 | 07.07.1989 Original published format: GB 8915583 | [1997/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0803791 | Date: | 29.10.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0803791 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/04, G06F13/40, H03M9/00 | [1997/44] | CPC: |
G06F1/04 (EP,US);
H03K5/00006 (EP,US);
H03K5/13 (EP,US);
H03K5/151 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/44] | Title | German: | Takterzeugungsschaltung | [1997/44] | English: | Clock Generation | [1997/44] | French: | Circuit de génération d'horloge | [1997/44] | Examination procedure | 12.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 13.03.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.04.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90306976.3 / EP0407082 | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.06.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0138276 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * page 1 - page 3, line 9 * * page 9, line 6 - page 10, line 3 * * abstract * [A] 4,7; | [XA]EP0274606 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * column 1, line 1 - line 30 * * column 3, line 24 - column 7, line 30 * * abstract * [A] 4,7; | [A]US3631464 (DAHLBERG ROGER C) [A] 3,4,7 * column 1, line 18 - line 46 * * column 2, line 18 - line 55 * * column 3, line 56 - line 75 * * column 4, line 37 - line 49 * * figures 1,5,8 * |