EP0818888 - Switchable band filter for multiband-tuner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2001 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | For:ES
FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/35] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/03] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:ES
FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lange, Joachim c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [1999/45] | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/03] | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97201866.7 | 19.06.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | DE1996128186 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628186 | [1998/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0818888 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0818888 | Date: | 27.09.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H03J5/24 | [1998/03] | CPC: |
H03J5/244 (EP,KR,US);
H03H7/0123 (KR);
H03H7/1775 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [1998/39] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Umschaltbares Bandfilter für Mehrband-Tuner | [1998/03] | English: | Switchable band filter for multiband-tuner | [1998/03] | French: | Filtre passe-bande commutable pour tuner multi-gammes | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/37] | 06.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 27.09.2000 | [2002/27] | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0429914 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1-10 * column 3, line 44 - column 6, line 39; figure 4 *; | [Y]GB2196198 (TELEFUNKEN ELECTRONIC GMBH) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, line 97 - page 2, line 126; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2117588 (RCA CORP) [A] 1 * page 4, line 48 - line 118; figures 1,3,4 * |