EP0816078 - A method and device for cleaning guide rollers in a printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2002 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2002 [2002/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JIMEK AB Box 14 232 01 Arlöv / SE | [1998/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hansson, Birger Nils Pers väg 5 232 51 Akarp / SE | [1998/02] | Representative(s) | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/02] | Petri, Stellan, et al Ström & Gulliksson AB Box 41 88 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 97202028.3 | 02.07.1997 | [1998/02] | Priority number, date | SE19960002655 | 05.07.1996 Original published format: SE 9602655 | [1998/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0816078 | Date: | 07.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0816078 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0816078 | Date: | 24.10.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B41F35/00 | [1998/02] | CPC: |
B41F35/00 (EP);
B41P2235/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1999/10] |
Former [1998/02] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Führungswalzen in einer Druckmaschine | [2001/42] | English: | A method and device for cleaning guide rollers in a printing press | [1998/02] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour nettoyer des rouleaux de guidage dans une machine à imprimer | [1998/02] |
Former [1998/02] | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Führungswalzen in einerDruckmaschine | Examination procedure | 21.07.1998 | Examination requested [1998/38] | 29.12.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT | 01.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.03.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/42] | Request for further processing for: | 11.03.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 11.03.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.01.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 29.01.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0423093 (HANSSON BIRGER ;HULTBERG STEN (SE)) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE3900657 (GEORG, ROLF) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 2, lines 41-49 * * column 3, lines 21-30 *; | [Y]US4781116 (HARADA MATSUO) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [A]EP0327975 (BALDWIN NIPPON KK) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4434052 (BVS GMBH) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [T]EP0781656 (JIMEK AB) [T] 9 * abstract * |