EP0818924 - Apparatus for recording and reproducing videosignals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2012 [2012/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/08] | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing S.A. 46, quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2002/29] | For all designated states BTS Holding International B.V. Kapittelweg 10 4827 HG Breda / NL | ||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/35] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1998/03] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:FR
GB
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fegesch, Henrik c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
Wüst, Wilfried c/o Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH. Röntgenstrasse 24, 22335 Hamburg / DE | [1998/03] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/13] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | Lindemann, Robert Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2006/21] | Lindemann, Robert Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2002/29] | Ruellan-Lemonnier, Brigitte THOMSON multimedia, Licensing and IP, 46 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92648 Boulogne cedex / FR | ||
Former [1998/15] | Schmalz, Günther Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/12] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/03] | Erdmann, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97202052.3 | 03.07.1997 | [1998/03] | Priority number, date | DE19961028187 | 12.07.1996 Original published format: DE 19628187 | [1998/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0818924 | Date: | 14.01.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0818924 | Date: | 08.12.1999 | [1999/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/77, H04N5/28, H04N5/262, H04N5/783 | [1999/50] | CPC: |
H04N5/28 (EP,US);
H04N5/262 (EP,US);
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/03] | H04N5/77, H04N5/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/33] |
Former [1998/03] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Aufnahme und Wiedergabe von Videosignalen | [1998/03] | English: | Apparatus for recording and reproducing videosignals | [1998/03] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement et de reproduction de signaux vidéo | [1998/03] | Examination procedure | 08.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/31] | 09.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/30] | 08.03.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 17.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 24.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2011 | 15   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PY]EP0762756 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [PY] 1-3 * page 5, line 14 - line 19; figure 1 * * page 6, line 1 - line 5 *; | [Y]JPH08138318 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-3; | [Y]JPH06125526 ; | [PA]EP0781056 (THOMSON BROADCAST SYSTEMS [FR]) [PA] 1,3 * page 3, line 32 - line 36; figure 1B * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940804), vol. 018, no. 416, Database accession no. (E - 1588), & JP06125526 A 19940506 (HOEI:KK) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * |