EP0806423 - Aminomethylene substituted non-aromatic heterocycles and use as substance p antagonists [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2007 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2007 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/46] | For all designated states PFIZER INC. 235 East 42nd Street New York, N.Y. 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Howard, Harry R. 272 Westwoods Terrace Bristol CT 06010 / US | 02 /
O'Neill, Brian T. 18 Clapboard Hill road Old Saybrook, Connecticut 16475 / US | [1998/03] |
Former [1997/46] | 01 /
Howard, Harry R. 272 Westwoods Terrace Bristol CT 06010 / US | ||
02 /
O'Neill, Brian T. 1526 Essex Road Westbrook, CT 06498 / US | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [1997/46] | Stevens, Ian Edward, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins, 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 97202174.5 | 07.10.1993 | [1997/46] | Priority number, date | US19920988653 | 10.12.1992 Original published format: US 988653 | [1997/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0806423 | Date: | 12.11.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, C07D417/12, C07D487/08, C07D409/12, A61K31/42, A61K31/445, A61K31/425, C07D277/64, C07D277/66, C07D261/20, C07D263/56, C07D453/02 | [1997/46] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/26 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1997/46] | Title | German: | Durch eine aminomethylen Gruppe substituierte nicht-aromatischen Heterocyclen und ihre Verwendung als Substanz P Antagonisten | [1997/46] | English: | Aminomethylene substituted non-aromatic heterocycles and use as substance p antagonists | [1997/46] | French: | Hétérocycles non aromatiques substitués par un groupe aminométhylène et leur utilisation comme antagonistes de la substance P | [1997/46] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 02.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M11) | 08.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.06.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.07.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.07.2002 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/51] | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2007/51] | Appeal following examination | 26.09.2002 | Appeal received No. T0282/03 | 29.11.2002 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.11.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP93922821.9 / EP0675886 | Request for further processing for: | 08.10.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 08.10.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.10.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   17.12.2001 | 31.10.2005 | 13   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2006 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9005525 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * claims 1,33,37,38,46 *; | [Y]WO9005729 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * claims 1,37-46 *; | [Y]WO9109844 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * claims 1,21-26 *; | [Y]WO9118878 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * page 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9201688 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * claims 1,24-26 *; | [Y]WO9206079 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * claims 1,20-29 *; | [Y]WO9217449 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * page 11; claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9220676 (PFIZER [US]) [Y] 1,2,12-15 * claims 1,34-41 *; | [PY]WO9300330 (PFIZER [US]) [PY] 1,2,12-15* claims 1,7-14 *; | [PY]WO9301170 (PFIZER [US]) [PY] 1,2,12-15 * claims 1,3-8 * |