EP0822096 - Laser dye or pigment removal imaging process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.05.2001 [2001/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/06] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tutt, Lee William, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Burberry, Mitchell Stewart, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
DePalma, Vito A., Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Goebel, William Keith, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 05 /
Tunney, Scott Eric, Eastman Kodak Company Patent Legal Staff, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1998/06] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/38] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1998/06] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, Dr., Dipl.-Chem., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97202265.1 | 18.07.1997 | [1998/06] | Priority number, date | US19960681582 | 29.07.1996 Original published format: US 681582 | [1998/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0822096 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0822096 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41M7/00, B41M5/24 | [1998/06] | CPC: |
B41M5/24 (EP,US);
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
G03G17/00 (EP,US);
H05K3/065 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/49] |
Former [1998/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsverfahren durch Laserablation von Farbstoff | [1998/06] | English: | Laser dye or pigment removal imaging process | [1998/06] | French: | Impression par ablation au laser de colorants ou pigments | [1998/06] | Examination procedure | 12.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/19] | 16.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5045888 (IMAEDA MIKIO [JP]) [YD] 1-7 * column 5, line 6 - line 9 * * claims 19,20 * * column W *; | [Y]DE3315139 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * page 39, line 10 - line 25; figure 18 * * claims 1,5 *; | [Y]EP0636490 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 1-7 * page 3, line 11 * * page 5, line 29 * * claims 1,7,9 * * the whole document *; | [Y]US5399459 (SIMPSON WILLIAM H [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5-7 * column 6, line 39 - line 41 * * claims 1,5,6,8 * * column W * |