EP0829383 - Latchable stabiliser bar actuator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Delphi Technologies, Inc. PO Box 5052 Troy, MI 48007 / US | [2000/48] |
Former [1998/12] | For all designated states GENERAL MOTORS CORPORATION General Motors Building 3044 West Grand Boulevard Detroit Michigan 48202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jensen, Eric Lee 165 Manor Lane Dayton, Ohio 45429 / US | 02 /
Fehring, John David 161 Edwards Road Waynesville, Ohio 45068 / US | 03 /
Kruckemeyer, William Charles 2935 Tara Trail Beavercreek, Ohio 45434 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi France SAS Bât. le Raspail - ZAC Paris Nord 2 22, avenue des Nations CS 65059 Villepinte 95972 Roissy CDG Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/12] | Denton, Michael John, et al Delphi Automotive Systems Centre Technique Paris 117 avenue des Nations B.P. 60059 95972 Roissy Charles de Gaulle Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 97202553.0 | 20.08.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | US19960724289 | 16.09.1996 Original published format: US 724289 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829383 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0829383 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B60G21/055 | [1998/12] | CPC: |
F16F9/46 (EP,US);
B60G21/0556 (EP,US);
B60G2202/135 (EP,US);
B60G2202/413 (EP,US);
B60G2202/42 (EP,US);
B60G2206/40 (EP,US);
B60G2400/104 (EP,US);
B60G2400/204 (EP,US);
B60G2500/20 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1999/52] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sperrbares Stellglied für einen Stabilisator | [1998/12] | English: | Latchable stabiliser bar actuator | [1998/12] | French: | Actionneur verrouillable pour barre stabilisatrice | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/21] | 19.12.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1095506 (ALLINQUANT) [A] 1-3 * figure - *; | [A]DE2849015 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0218120 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 20 *; | [YA]EP0285909 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1 * abstract * [A] 2,3; | [A]US4828283 (ISHII KATSUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * figures 6,7,9 *; | [A]DE4008324 (BOGE) [A] 1,2* figure 1 *; | [A]FR2697474 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5505480 (PASCARELLA ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 1 * column A; figure - * |