EP0836969 - Air bag steering wheel with visible spokes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 5300 Old Tampa Highway, Lakeland, County of Polk Florida / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/34] | For all designated states BREED AUTOMOTIVE TECHNOLOGY, INC. 5300 Old Tampa Highway Lakeland, County of Polk, Florida / US | ||
Former [1998/17] | For all designated states MOMO S.P.A. Via Decemviri, 20 I-20138 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cattaneo, Marco Via Frank, 32 27100 Pavia / IT | [1998/17] | Representative(s) | Mittler, Enrico, et al Mittler & C. S.r.l. Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/11] | Mittler, Enrico, et al c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/17] | Mittler, Enrico c/o Mittler & C. s.r.l., Viale Lombardia, 20 20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97203141.3 | 09.10.1997 | [1998/17] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI02133 | 15.10.1996 Original published format: IT MI962133 | [1998/17] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0836969 | Date: | 22.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836969 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20, B62D1/04 | [1998/17] | CPC: |
B60R21/203 (EP,US);
B62D1/04 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20834 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/01] |
Former [1998/17] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Luftsack aufweisendes Lenkrad mit sichtbaren Speichen | [1998/17] | English: | Air bag steering wheel with visible spokes | [1998/17] | French: | Volant de direction avec module de sac gonflable et rayons visibles. | [1998/17] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1998 | Examination requested [1998/51] | 23.10.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 21.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 12.06.2003 | ES | 30.09.2003 | [2012/37] |
Former [2004/04] | SE | 12.06.2003 | |
ES | 30.09.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 12.06.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2242871 (AUTOLIV DEV [SE]) [X] 1,4 * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 16 - line 31; figure 1 * [Y] 2,3,5; | [Y]US3827715 (LYNCH R) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 43 - column 3, line 17; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]GB2192841 (TRW REPA GMBH) [Y] 1 * page 2, line 102 - line 126; figures 1,4-6 *; | [Y]DE3508380 (TOYODA GOSEI KK [JP]) [Y] 2,5 * page 6, line 11 - page 7, line 13; figure - *; | [Y]GB1238644 (CLIFFORD COVERING COMPANY) [Y] 3 * page 1, line 60 - line 64 *; | [A]US4167276 (BELL LON E, et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 19 - line 53; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE3742125 (NIHON PLAST CO LTD [JP]) [A] 2 * column 5, line 64 - column 6, line 43; figures 12,13 *; | [A]EP0050309 (MOMO SPA [IT]) [A] 4 * page 3, line 5 - line 14 * * page 6, line 15 - line 19 *; | [A]GB2142299 (PERSONAL SPA) [A] 5 * figure - * |