EP0908900 - A method for permanently marking x-ray screens [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2001 [2001/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agfa-Gevaert N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/15] | For all designated states AGFA-GEVAERT N.V. Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Struye, Luc c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | 02 /
Leblans, Paul c/o Agfa-Gevaert N.V., IIE 3800, Septestraat 27 2640 Mortsel / BE | [1999/15] | Application number, filing date | 97203176.9 | 13.10.1997 | [1999/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0908900 | Date: | 14.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G21K4/00, G03C11/02, G03C5/17 | [1999/15] | CPC: |
G21K4/00 (EP);
G03C11/02 (EP);
G03C5/17 (EP);
G21K2004/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB [1999/52] |
Former [1999/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur permanent Markierung der Röntgenstrahlschirmen | [1999/15] | English: | A method for permanently marking x-ray screens | [1999/15] | French: | Procédé pour le marquage permanent d'écrans pour rayons X | [1999/15] | Examination procedure | 14.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/49] | 01.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/47] | 15.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2000 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62130400 ; | [A]JPH0443079 ; | [A]EP0481648 (SIMON MARKETING INC); | [A]EP0184132 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]EP0602714 (AGFA GEVAERT NV) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 29, Database accession no. 87-202386, XP002059312 & JPS62130400 A 19870612 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 13, Database accession no. 92-100734, XP002059313 & JPH0443079 A 19920213 (TOYO INK MFG CO) [A] * abstract * |